pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Asia Pacific Forum Incorporated
CC57650
9429047835375
Registered

Registration details

19/12/2019
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 6826
Wellesley Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1141
Room 208, Wesley Bicentenial Hall
78 Pitt Street
Newton
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

+64 21 297 3187

Oceania

Australia, Fiji, Marshall Islands, Samoa, Solomon Islands

North America

United States

Asia

Afghanistan, Bahrain, Bangladesh, Bhutan, Cambodia, China, India, Indonesia, Iran, Japan, Korea, South, Kuwait, Malaysia, Maldives, Nepal, Oman, Pakistan, Philippines, Qatar, Saudi Arabia, Singapore, Thailand, United Arab Emirates, Vietnam


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

5. Stated Purpose and Objects of the Asia Pacific Forum a. The purpose of the APF is to support the development of, and encourage the growth of recovery from drug addiction in the countries within the APF zone so anyone in the world has the opportunity to experience recovery in their own language and culture and find the opportunity for a new way of life by: i. Arranging and participating in meetings with government representatives about how recovery can contribute to drug free recovery for peop

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Health

General public

Entity Structure

6. Managing Committee (Admin Committee) a. The APF is managed by the “Admin Committee”; comprising the following four persons: i. The Chairperson; ii. The Secretary; iii. The Treasurer; and iv. The Fellowship Development Coordinator. b. The Chair and two members of the committee are nominated as registered officers for charitable purposes. c. There shall be a minimum of three Admin Committee Members. d. In addition to the Admin Committee members, other members may be elected to roles as the APF

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ended 31 December 2019 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 26/06/2021 $101,500 $36,396
30/06/2020 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bijay Lama Secretary 22/02/2021
David Tomasiello Fellowship Development Co-ordinator 22/02/2021
MD. Hasib Bin Yakub Treasurer 22/02/2021
Ahmed Reza Chairperson 5/12/2019
Roger Searle Officer 5/12/2019
Sharon Kerr Officer 5/12/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sushil Poudel Treasurer 1/09/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/08/2021 NOC010
5/01/2021 NOC008
23/09/2020 NOC003
17/04/2020 NOC002

Charity Documents