pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Youth Events Society Incorporated
TEDxYouth@TeAro
CC57803
9429047776487
Registered

Registration details

16/02/2020
March 31

Address for service

36 Davidson Crescent
Tawa
Wellington
5028

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Society is established and maintained exclusively for charitable purposes (including any purposes ancillary to those charitable purposes), namely to advance education by training and upskilling young people in leadership, public speaking, event organisation, and other ancillary skills, and by organising events to give young people the opportunity to learn such skills in a practical context.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Education / training / research

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Members elect a Board, consisting of a Chair, Secretary, Treasurer, and 2-4 General Members. This Board functions as the executive of the Society and manages its day-to-day operations. Our events are organised in partnership with independent organisers, and are governed both by agreements between said organisers and the Society, and by agreements between said organisers and the creators of formats they license. The Society functions as the legal personality/controlling entity for the events.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2020 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 28/09/2021 $2,660 $1,263
30/09/2020 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anastasia Reid General Member of the Board 25/06/2021
Cianell Navarro Society Treasurer, Member of the Board 25/06/2021
Sarah Davitt General Member of the Board 25/06/2021
Bethany Alice Kaye-Blake General Member of the Board 4/11/2019
Jackson William James Lacy Chair of the Board 4/11/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alexandria Daisy Maynard Steele General Member of the Board 25/06/2021
Allegra Barbara Preddey General Member of the Board 25/06/2021
George Lewis Garnett Society Treasurer, Member of the Board 25/06/2021
Lilly Zhang General Member of the Board 25/06/2021
Olivia Jane Trass Society Secretary, Member of the Board 30/06/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/07/2021 NOC002
6/07/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents