pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Blue Cradle Foundation
CC57834
9429048308519
Registered

Registration details

23/06/2020
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 21045
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
bluecradleNZ
Twitter icon image
blue_cradle
Instagram @bluecradleNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

- Promoting the conservation and regeneration of the ocean is ecosystems and species. - Promoting and supporting communities working on ocean health impact in NZ and beyond. - Promoting ocean literacy marine science and conservation education and ocean science for sustainable development.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust governed by trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 19/09/2023 $93,729 $123,632
30/09/2022 13/07/2022 $123,533 $86,916
30/09/2021 2/07/2021 $15,019 $14,102

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michelle Rush Trustee/Donor 1/11/2023
Rasmika Maharaj Trustee/Donor 1/11/2023
Sam Rowland Trustee/Donor 1/11/2023
Stacey Te Pōhue Rose Trustee/Donor 1/11/2023
Katherine Mary Short Trustee/Donor 5/07/2021
James Alexander Nikitine Chair/Trustee/Donor 2/06/2020
Jocelyn Gae Papprill Trustee/Donor 2/06/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Liam Ramsay Tuaivi Kokaua Trustee/Donor 31/10/2023
Geoffroy Lamarche Trustee/Donor 30/11/2021
Ben Lewis Parker Trustee/Donor 22/04/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/11/2023 NOC014
8/11/2023 NOC013
7/11/2023 NOC012
7/11/2023 NOC011
27/04/2022 NOC008
10/12/2021 NOC007
1/12/2021 NOC006
23/07/2021 NOC005
20/03/2021 NOC003
1/07/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents