pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Arden Auxiliary Medical Trust
CC57872
N/A
Registered

Registration details

17/07/2020
March 31

Address for service

172 Brigham Creek Road
Hobsonville
Auckland
0618

Charity's other details


Oceania

Australia, Fiji, Kiribati, Marshall Islands, Micronesia, Nauru, Niue, Palau, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Tuvalu, Vanuatu

Africa

Angola, Botswana, Burkina, Burundi, Cameroon, Cape Verde, Egypt, Equatorial Guinea, Eritrea, Ethiopia, Guinea-Bissau, Kenya, Liberia, Libya, Madagascar, Malawi, Mauritius, Morocco, Namibia, Niger, Nigeria, Rwanda, Senegal, Seychelles, Sierra Leone, South Africa, Uganda

South America

Argentina, Bolivia, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Ecuador, Guyana, Paraguay, Peru, Suriname, Uruguay, Venezuela

North America

Antigua and Barbuda, Bahamas, Barbados, Belize, Canada, Costa Rica, Cuba, Dominica, Dominican Republic, El Salvador, Grenada, Guatemala, Haiti, Honduras, Jamaica, Mexico, Nicaragua, Panama, Saint Kitts and Nevis, Saint Lucia, Saint Vincent and the Grenadines, Trinidad and Tobago, United States

Asia

Afghanistan, Bahrain, Bangladesh, Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, China, India, Indonesia, Israel, Japan, Jordan, Kazakhstan, Korea, South, Kuwait, Kyrgyzstan, Laos, Lebanon, Malaysia, Maldives, Mongolia, Nepal, Pakistan, Philippines, Qatar, Russian Federation, Singapore, Sri Lanka, Tajikistan, Thailand, Turkey, United Arab Emirates, Uzbekistan, Vietnam

Europe

Albania, Andorra, Armenia, Austria, Azerbaijan, Belarus, Belgium, Bosnia and Herzegovina, Bulgaria, Croatia, Cyprus, Czech Republic, Denmark, Estonia, Finland, France, Georgia, Germany, Greece, Hungary, Iceland, Ireland, Italy, Latvia, Liechtenstein, Lithuania, Luxembourg, Macedonia, Malta, Moldova, Monaco, Montenegro, Netherlands, Norway, Poland, Portugal, Romania, San Marino, Serbia, Slovakia, Slovenia, Spain, Sweden, Switzerland, Ukraine, United Kingdom, Vatican City


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Manufacture and distribute ventilator and oxygen producing equipment to assist individuals survive the effects of Covid 19 throughout the world in the name of Arden Auxiliary Medical Trust funded by contributions throughout the world.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Fund-raising

General public

Entity Structure

The structure is in accordance with the Arden Auxiliary Medical Trust supported by highly qualified technical individuals volunteering their services freely along with other voluntary financial contributions from throughout the world. The trust is for the purposes of managing design manufacture and distribution of ventilator and oxygen medical equipment with a focus on supporting those infected by Covid 19. The trust operates independently from any other entity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/10/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael Ilewicz Officer 26/07/2020
Alan Gordon Thomas Trustee of Arden Auxiliary Medical Trust 26/06/2020

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents