Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Kuiti Korowai Aroha Charitable Trust
CC57904
N/A
Registered

Registration details

22/05/2023
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
Registered 22/05/2023
De-registered 16/05/2023 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act
Registered 11/03/2020

Address for service

193 Rora Street
Te Kūiti
Te Kuiti
3910

Charity's other details

0276742073
https://www.facebook.com/Te-Kuiti-Korowai-Aroha-Charitable-Trust


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We operate the local foodbank which serves Te Kuti, Waitomo, Piopio and Otorohanga. We have our own community shop which funds our foodbank.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 1 August 2020 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Adalyn Bell Trustee 1/11/2022
Antonio Shane Mangioni-Ashby Chair/Treasurer 17/10/2020
Piki Knap Secretary/Trustee 17/10/2020
Shannon Tariki Mangu Manawaiti Trustee 17/10/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jacqueline Evelyn Onnsby Trustee 17/10/2020
Jacob Karwyn Ngarewa Chairman/Trustee 1/08/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/11/2022 NOC003
3/11/2020 NOC002
3/11/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.