pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Eat Less Plastic
CC58186
N/A
Registered

Registration details

24/08/2020
March 31

Address for service

89 Stanley Point Road
Stanley Point
Auckland
0624

Charity's other details


Oceania

Fiji, Niue, Samoa, Tonga


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To Advance education about the ocean and the global plastic pollution problem

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust with three founding Trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 28/09/2021 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Magen Elizabeth Schifiliti Trustee 23/11/2019
Philip Douglas Somoerville Trustee 23/11/2019
Rosalie Ann Carnahan-Darby Trustee 23/11/2019

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents