Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


A Day of Magic Charitable Trust
CC58197
9429047548886
Registered

Registration details

29/08/2020
March 31

Address for service

4 Lees Way
Otumoetai
Tauranga
3110

Charity's other details

www.facebook.com/adayofmagic.nz
www.instagram.com/adayofmagic.nz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Being beneficial to the community by providing respite and relief to terminally ill persons and their immediate relatives; and being beneficial to the community by improving the physical and psychological wellbeing of people who are terminally ill and their immediate relatives, by providing a special experience or experiences to create lasting memories. To do any such acts, matters and things as the Trust may deem incidental or otherwise conducive to the attainment of the above objects.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Event Planning & Delivery)

Other (please state)

()

Other (please state)

(New Zealanders that are in the terminally phase who are facing end of life.)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 18/10/2024 $5,754 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 14/10/2023 26/11/2023 $42,809 $44,362 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 5/10/2022 $200 $16,388 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/12/2021 26/12/2021 $4,341 $10,119 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Melanie Quin Settlor 19/06/2019
Paige Smith Original Trustee 19/06/2019
Vicki Thompson Original Trustee 19/06/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/09/2024 NOC009
10/07/2024 NOC008
14/12/2021 NOC004
18/09/2020 NOC003
17/09/2020 NOC002
17/09/2020 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.