Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


MIYC - MANUKAU ISLAMIC YOUTH CENTRE
CC58233
9429048579490
Registered

Registration details

14/09/2020
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
LIFE NZ - Leadership, Islamic Faith & Education Trust 14/09/2020
MIYC - MANUKAU ISLAMIC YOUTH CENTRE 28/01/2021

Address for service

4 Cloghfin Place
Flat Bush
Auckland
2019
38 St George Street
Papatoetoe
Auckland
2025

Charity's other details

Manukau Islamic Youth Centre - MIYC


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our primary goal is to foster spiritual and intellectual growth and development as well as unity amongst the wider community through religious, recreational and social programs that furthers our understanding of Islaam and while maintaining the integrity of the Qur'aan and Sunnah and abiding by the laws of the Country.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Education / training / research, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

Religious groups

Entity Structure

We have six trustees in our governance board which includes Chairperson, Treasurer & Secretary.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 29/09/2023 $516,779 $151,254 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 25/09/2022 $122,018 $79,463 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 31/10/2021 29/10/2021 $55,827 $28,702 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mohammed Aziz Chairperson 4/02/2024
Fauzan Ali Trustee 18/08/2020
Tanzeel Saiyad Hussain Trustee 18/08/2020
Yunus Khan Trustee 18/08/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Justin Murti Trustee 22/02/2023
Zubair Khan Trustee 17/01/2023
Zubair Khan Trustee 16/01/2023
Mohammed Faiaz Hussein Trustee 23/10/2022
Sharfaz Khan Trustee 16/02/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/02/2024 NOC016
1/06/2023 NOC013
28/02/2023 NOC012
18/01/2023 NOC011
28/10/2022 NOC010
28/10/2022 NOC009
19/02/2022 NOC007
17/02/2021 NOC005
17/02/2021 NOC004
28/01/2021 NOC002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.