Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Defeat Multiple System Atrophy (MSA) New Zealand Trust
CC58451
9429048728935
Registered

Registration details

11/6/2020
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Defeat Multiple System Atrophy Australia and New Zealand Trust 11/6/2020
Defeat Multiple System Atrophy (MSA) New Zealand Trust 1/22/2023

Address for service

PO Box 125238
St Heliers
Auckland
1740

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/msakiwi
https://twitter.com/NewZealandMSA
https://www.instagram.com/msanewzealand/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Promoting the prevention or control of Multiple System Atrophy and supporting patients with the disease, and their families;

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Incorporated Charitable Trust Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
3/31/2024 9/30/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
3/31/2023 9/30/2023 9/30/2023 $848 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2022 9/30/2022 8/31/2022 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2021 9/30/2021 8/20/2021 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Raymond Pereira Trustee 10/1/2023
Chloe Dickinson Trustee 4/12/2023
Brent Evans Trustee 11/8/2022
Philip Michael Fortier Trustee 10/16/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stephen Donald Trustee 3/5/2023
Jacqueline Maria Simpson Trustee 1/3/2023
Olivia Romano Trustee 10/24/2022
Stephen Lindsay Donald Trustee 10/23/2022
Wikiwira Mihirei Pokiha Trustee 2/12/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/1/2023 NOC021
8/6/2023 NOC019
4/14/2023 NOC018
4/14/2023 NOC016
4/14/2023 NOC015
1/24/2023 NOC014
1/23/2023 NOC013
1/23/2023 NOC012
1/22/2023 NOC011
1/22/2023 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.