Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Greenpeace Aotearoa Incorporated
Greenpeace of New Zealand Incorporated
CC58459
9429042628842
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

Private Bag 92507
Victoria Street West
Auckland Central
Auckland
1142
11 Akiraho Street
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details

09 630 6317
09 630 7121
https://www.facebook.com/greenpeace.nz
https://twitter.com/GreenpeaceNZ


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote the philosophy that humanity is part of the planet and its interconnected web of life and whatever we do to the planet we do to ourselves. To promote the protection and preservation of nature and the environment, including the oceans, lakes, rivers and other waters, the land and the air and flora and fauna everywhere and including but not limited to the promotion of conservation, peace, nuclear disarmament and the elimination of all weapons of mass destruction.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Care / protection of animals, Fund-raising

General public

Animals

Entity Structure

Greenpeace is a charitable incorporated society governed by a board of 6 or 7 members. The board delegates day to day management of the society to the Executive Director. The board is elected by a voting assembly comprising between 30 and 45 members. As at 31/12/2021 Greenpeace Aotearoa employed 78 staff.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing annual returns for the years ending 31 December 2008 to 31 December 2019 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 15/06/2023 $10,649,369 $9,918,733 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 7/06/2022 $11,126,025 $9,628,361 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 10/06/2021 $8,748,447 $8,177,304 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 - - - - Exempt
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 - - - - Exempt
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 - - - - Exempt
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 - - - - Exempt
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 - - - - Exempt
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 - - - - Exempt
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 - - - - Exempt
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Genevieve Toop Board member 20/05/2023
Te Kawa Robb Board member 7/06/2022
Emalani M K Case Board member 15/05/2021
Tui Warmenhoven Chair 30/06/2020
Pania Peta Newton Board member 27/06/2020
Rahul Watson Govindan Deputy Chair 27/06/2020
Lee Sinclair Treasurer 3/06/2017
Russel Norman Executive director 2/11/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Tong Chair 15/12/2022
Catherine Delahunty Board Member 21/05/2022
Melanie Benedict Rands Board Member 15/05/2021
Stephanie Mills Chairperson 30/06/2019
Wendy Reid Board Member 30/06/2019
Aroha Mead Board Member 30/06/2018
Simon Hart Board Member 30/06/2017
Lindsay Jeffs Board member 30/06/2015
Ann McDiarmid Executive Director 31/05/2015
Darren Day board member 30/06/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/06/2023 NOC008
21/02/2023 NOC005
3/10/2022 NOC004
18/05/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.