Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wairarapa Dark Sky Association Incorporated
CC58475
9429046538826
Registered

Registration details

29/11/2020
March 31

Address for service

49 White Rock Road
Martinborough
5781

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The fundamental purpose of the WDSA as at 1 April 2022 was to complete the work required to achieve international recognition of the Wairarapa for its world class dark skies (amongst the best in the world). This was achieved on 19 January 2023 when the International Dark Sky Association awarded WDSA Reserve status to the area of the Wairarapa covered by the Carterton District council and the South Wairarapa District Council. Now that Reserve stated is achieved, the WDSA has shifted its focus to: 1) the structural changes required to hold IDA Dark Sky Reserve status for the Wairarapa permanently; and 2) assisting the neighbouring Masterton District Council to achieving Dark Sky Reserve status to its area. When complete, the entire Wairarapa region will be an International Dark Sky Reserve.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

WDSA is a registered incorporated society. It was set up on 8 January 2018. It is managed by a committee of eight including three officers (chair, secretary and treasurer). It is registered as a charity. At their AGM on 7 July 2023, the WDSA agreed that it would approach the Registrar of Incorporated Societies to have its name changed to the Wairarapa Dark Sky Reserve Inc. This name better reflects the societies long term purpose.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 7/07/2023 $215 $4,858 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 2/06/2022 $15,001 $9,044 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/04/2021 $10,414 $25,856 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Vivien Lewanna Napier Chairperson 22/11/2019
Wyatt Beetham Creech Treasurer 22/11/2019
Raymond Walter Lilley Secretary 8/01/2018

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.