Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Everyone an Artist Trust
New Zealand China Union of Culture and Arts
CC58517
N/A
Registered

Registration details

14/12/2020
March 31

Address for service

1 Hereford Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/EveryoneAnArtist/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

a. To advance engagement in the Arts, diversity of arts, and to support local artists; b. To promote aesthetics in education; c. To use the arts to promote the protections of the environment and promote multicultural communication; d. To use the arts to support individuals of all ages and all backgrounds to maintain mental health at a post-pandemic stage; e. To facilitate language education across ethnic communities, helping refugees and migrants with work and education.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

Incorporated Charitable Trust Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/11/2024 19/11/2024 $81,061 $82,780 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 21/09/2023 $113,062 $108,088 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 19/09/2022 $56,019 $74,677 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 14/05/2021 $61,000 $16,961 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Qi Yang trustee 8/12/2020
Lily Ping Li trustee 22/09/2020
Roy Yi Lu trustee 22/09/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/08/2024 NOC006
20/08/2021 NOC003
18/08/2021 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.