pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Migrants Aotearoa
CC58593
N/A
Deregistered
16/05/2022
We are reducing our projects and have less capacity to handle charity admin tasks and other requirements.

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$321
$0

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:

  • Retained as they are continuing to operate

Below are details of Migrants Aotearoa at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

15/12/2020
March 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 16/05/2022 The charity is continuing to operate but does not want to be registered any longer
Registered 15/12/2020

Address for service

Flat 6
107 Majoribanks Street
Mount Victoria
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The provision of support to migrants in New Zealand

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides assistance to migrants in need

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development

Migrants / refugees

General public

Entity Structure

Incorporated Charitable Trust Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 29/06/2021 $805 $707

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mylène Marie Baland Trustee 26/01/2022
Andres Leonardo Proano Valencia trustee 19/09/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Carolina Laura Flora Diaz trustee 9/03/2022
Eliana Karin Darroch trustee 8/01/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/04/2022 NOC008
11/04/2022 NOC007
3/02/2022 NOC006
3/03/2021 NOC004
16/02/2021 NOC003
15/02/2021 NOC002
15/02/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents