pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Geoconservation Trust
CC58714
9429048840361
Registered

Registration details

26/01/2021
March 31

Address for service

52 Hukutaia Road
Opotiki
3122

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Recognising principles of geoethics, geodiversity, and geoconservation as necessary in building a sustainable and low-impact framework for protecting New Zealand’s unique, fragile, and world-class geological features within a culturally and environmentally rich landscape. With Te Tiriti o Waitangi as the founding document of Aotearoa New Zealand for Tangata Whenua and the people of The Crown, our cultural landscapes, archaeological sites and taonga will be respected by the Trust.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

We are an Aotearoa New Zealand Based Trust. Our trust deed states that we must have between three and seven Trustees. We currently have three Trustees that constitute our governance board, including three executive positions: president, treasurer and secretary.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2021 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Karoly Nemeth President 26/01/2021
Christopher John Twemlow Treasurer 14/12/2020
Ilmars Gravis Secretary 14/12/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/04/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents