Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Music Centre Charitable Trust
Wellington Music Centre
CC59068
9429049243505
Registered

Registration details

30/04/2021
June 30

Address for service

25 Ahuriri Street
Strathmore Park
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

www.facebook.com/Wellington.Music.Centre


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust is established for the purpose within New Zealand, to advance education, particularly in relation to music, by: - providing affordable music instrumental tuition as an introduction to music for children and families of all economic status and position - enabling the continuation of the Wellington Music Centre operation in the Wellington region which has been operating for over 30 years.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 30 June 2021 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 22/11/2023 $30,199 $24,929 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 20/12/2022 $28,761 $17,961 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dilini Yapa Parent Representative to Board and Trustee of Board 16/04/2024
Brenda Solon Board Member and Trustee 4/04/2024
Peter Andrew Liley Music Director 5/10/2023
Samuel Neil Holmes Treasurer 31/07/2023
Martin Nicholas Michael Punter Secretary 6/03/2023
Andreas Gerd Paul Nathanael Lepper Trustee of Board 12/04/2021
Bernard Carlyle Wells Chairperson of Board 12/04/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Karl James Menzies Chairperson of Board 27/02/2024
Hanne Skarstøl Jøstensen Trustee of Board 11/04/2023
John Forrest Kibblewhite Treasurer 10/12/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/04/2024 NOC008
14/03/2024 NOC007
28/08/2023 NOC005
11/04/2023 NOC004
22/08/2022 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.