Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Sikh Youth
CC59083
9429049703948
Registered

Registration details

22/05/2021
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 97080
Manukau City
Manukau
Auckland
2241
120 Princes Street
Otahuhu
Auckland
1062

Charity's other details

www.facebook.com/nzsikhyouth
twitter.com/nzsikhyouth
www.instagram.com/nzsikhyouth


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

New Zealand Sikh Youth is a youth led representative organisation of the young Sikhs in New Zealand

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Community development

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 4/08/2024 $677 $1,213 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 29/07/2023 $1,214 $6,355 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/07/2022 $7,400 $88 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Simarjot Kaur Executive Committee Member 27/01/2025
Rajwant Kaur Sidhu Executive Committee Member 25/10/2024
Balkaran Singh Review Committee Member 18/08/2024
Balraj Singh Vice President 18/08/2024
Gurmanpreet Bawa Treasurer 18/08/2024
Harsimran Kaur Hundal Executive Committee Member 18/08/2024
Ishnoor Singh President 18/08/2024
Jind Kaur Secretary 18/08/2024
Karanjot Singh Executive Committee Member 18/08/2024
Jagbir Singh Chahal Review Committee Chairperson 12/07/2020
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Harmanpreet Singh Bhatia Assistant Communications Director 14/11/2024
Amritpal Singh Committee Member 18/08/2024
Harman Singh Committee Member 18/08/2024
Jasmeet Singh Committee Member 18/08/2024
Rajdeep Singh Parhar Committee Member 18/08/2024
Kamanjot Kaur Vice President 27/10/2023
Gursharn Singh Communications Director 26/10/2023
Gurjot Singh Secretary 25/10/2023
Inderjit Singh President 25/10/2023
Gurjap Singh Committee Member 23/07/2023
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/01/2025 NOC018
24/09/2024 NOC016
20/12/2023 NOC013
20/12/2023 NOC012
24/08/2023 NOC011
1/11/2022 NOC007
6/07/2022 NOC006
4/07/2021 NOC003
4/07/2021 NOC002
14/06/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.