pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Southern Lakes Sanctuary Trust
CC59200
9429049432107
Registered

Registration details

6/07/2021
March 31

Address for service

153 Glenda Drive
Frankton
Queenstown
9300

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote the conservation, preservation and protection of New Zealand's native species and advance the objective of Predator Free 2050, as further set out in clause 4 of the Trust Deed.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

The SLST is a charitable trust with an Incorporated Board. The Board comprises of one Trustee representative for each of the Founding Members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Daniel Sweeney Trustee 26/10/2021
Leslie Van Gelder Trustee 26/10/2021
Neil Templeton Secretary 26/10/2021
Steve Batstone Trustee 26/10/2021
Christine Mary Vollebregt Trustee 15/06/2021
Douglas MacGregor Lind Trustee 15/06/2021
Geoffrey Hughes Trustee 15/06/2021
Joanna Susan Booker Trustee 15/06/2021
John Ross Sinclar Trustee 15/06/2021
Paul Thomas Hellebrekers Trustee 15/06/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Paul Brendan Kavanagh Trustee 8/11/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/11/2021 NOC002
22/10/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents