Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Autistic Collaboration Trust
CC59262
9429048244183
Registered

Registration details

26/07/2021
March 31

Address for service

286A Whau Valley Road
Whau Valley
Whangarei
0112

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/AutisticCollaboration/
https://twitter.com/AutCollab


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Development of free educational resources representing the views of the autistic community. Liberation of the pathology paradigm. Acceptance of autism as natural variance of the diversity of human minds. Creation of social network events and autistic-friendly organisations. Support and creation of projects which are run by autistic people.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Managed by a board of trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 29/09/2023 $466 $209 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 10/06/2022 $604 $262 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anne MacAulay Trustee 1/09/2020
Sarah Kollmann-Bettin Secretary, Treasurer 22/05/2020
Jorn Bettin Chairperson 20/05/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/12/2022 NOC003
29/05/2022 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.