Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Koha Shed Whanganui
The Koha Shed Whanganui
CC59520
N/A
Registered

Registration details

14/10/2021
March 31

Address for service

88 Duncan Street
Whanganui East
Whanganui
4500

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/thekohashed/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Purposes: 1. To help build a healthier happier community 2. To restore a fair and equitable society. 3. A mission to connect people and inspire hope by alleviating poverty. 4. To work with the homeless to ensure they are in transition to a more permanent situation. 5. Providing 24 hour service and advocacy for them.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

We provide free clothing, homewares, care and support for all that need it

Accommodation / housing

Social services

General public

Entity Structure

Chairperson, Sherron Sunnex Secretary Kiri Mckee Trustees / signatories. Elaine Hampton. Karen Veldhoen. Sherron Sunnex. Treasurer. Elaine Hampton. Other members Tania Bailey. Marama Dey.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 24/09/2024 $20,077 $21,480 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 29/09/2023 $30,714 $26,562 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 9/09/2022 $13,568 $14,717 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sharron Stuart Duff Board Member 3/06/2024
Elaine Hampton Treasurer 26/07/2022
Marama Venice Dey Chairperson 20/09/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Karen Anne Veldhoen Board Member 13/08/2024
Kiri Joan McKee Secretary 8/03/2024
Sherron Sunnex Chairperson 8/03/2024
Tania Aroha Bailey Board Member 8/03/2024
Tracy Ann Hutchinson Treasurer 15/03/2023
Sonny Barlow trust board member 10/02/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/08/2024 NOC005
26/07/2023 NOC003
19/02/2022 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.