Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Community Support Waitakere
CC59596
9429049950588
Registered

Registration details

6/10/2021
March 31

Address for service

21 Laingfield Terrace
Laingholm
Auckland
0604

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/groups/waitakere.org.nz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide a range of community support services to vulnerable New Zealand residents who are struggling to take care of themselves, including food assistance, budgeting advice, as well as mental and physical wellbeing support. To assist other similar support organisations and foodbanks by facilitating the donation and delivery of food, funds, and gifts from both national and international donors. To work with Government agencies, NGO's, and Community Organisations to provide poverty relief.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Community development

General public

Entity Structure

The Entitiy is largely volunteered based with no part time nor full-time employees. The executive committee meet every two months and have an annual AGM for all the members to attend.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 10/09/2022 $67,173 $61,261 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Doreen Sunman Trustee 21/02/2023
Elesha Thomas Trustee 17/02/2023
Patrick Sugrue Trustee 25/12/2022
Steven Leonard Price Trustee 6/10/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lorna Monica Price Trustee 17/02/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/03/2023 NOC003
10/03/2023 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.