Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Motorcycle Collective Limited
CC59600
9429049324662
Registered

Registration details

27/10/2021
June 30

Address for service

12 Britannia Street
Petone
Lower Hutt
5012

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(a) promote and facilitate the education and development of motorcycle mechanical skills; (b) advance mental health and wellbeing, particularly among motorcyclists and their friends and whānau; and (c) undertake any other charitable activity as the directors in their discretion think fit.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(DIY Community Motorcycle Workshop/Community Development/Teaching Basic DIY Motorcycle Mechanics)

Education / training / research

Health

General public

Legal Structure

Company
Motorcycle Collective Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 5/09/2024 $16,424 $9,994 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 8/02/2024 $12,490 $20,718 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 22/08/2022 $36,308 $27,103 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hudson Geoffrey Shaw Director 17/03/2024
Lloyd Kenneth Wilkinson Director 26/10/2021
Jethro Stephen Day Director 17/05/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Aaron Mark Jeffs Director 7/12/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/11/2021 NOC002
11/11/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.