Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Regional Charity Hospital Trust
Dorothy Spotswood Charity Hospital
CC59721
9429050110865
Registered

Registration details

14/12/2021
March 31

Address for service

Level 24, 157 Lambton Quay
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Wellington Regional Charity Hospital Trust are working towards a New Zealand where everyone has access to the medical services needed to live their life with dignity. This vision is the initiative of a group of clinicians and health professionals who, supported by volunteers, will give their time and skills pro-bono in support of it. Our purpose is to provide a hospital that provides free specialist day surgical services for people in the Wellington region who are ineligible or unable to access such care from the existing public health institutions and are unable to afford private medical care or health insurance. Purpose to provide hospital facilities to enable the provision of free surgical and medical services to individuals ineligible for care through the public health system or the Accident Compensation Corporation and who cannot meet the cost of private care.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provide a hospital that provides free specialist day surgical services for people in the Wellington region who are ineligible or unable to access such care from the existing public health institutions)

Health

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 23/07/2024 $197,861 $218,895 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 5/10/2023 $172,534 $193,816 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 28/11/2022 $100,221 $23,490 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 9 months from 01 July 2022 to 31 March 2023

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter Samuel Jackson Trustee 15/03/2023
Anna Helen Davison Trustee 19/10/2021
Graham James Sharpe Trustee 19/10/2021
James Andrew John Tietjens Trustee 19/10/2021
Murray David Jack Trustee 19/10/2021
Philip Berney Dashfield Trustee 19/10/2021
Timothy David Clarke Trustee 19/10/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/04/2025 NOC009
15/03/2023 NOC005
28/02/2023 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.