Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Tira Ahu Pae Incorporated
CC59741
9429043144327
Registered

Registration details

22/12/2021
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Massey University Students' Association Federation Incorporated 22/12/2021
Te Tira Ahu Pae Incorporated 14/11/2022

Address for service

Level 1, Student Centre, Student Services Building
Massey University, Tennants Drive, Turitea Campus,
Palmerston North
4474

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Te Tira Ahu Pae's core aim is to make sure that students enjoy the best university experience possible. We serve students by providing a platform for the voice of students, advocating student issues, and promoting the social, cultural, recreational, and educational interests of students on all Massey University Campuses, including distance students. Our vision is to create a student environment that empowers and supports all students of Massey to achieve their tertiary educational goals. Membership is open to all enrolled students at Massey on their enrolment date.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(Students of Massey University)

Entity Structure

MUSAF is an umbrella entity for 10 Massey University Student Associations, located in Wellington, Palmerston North, Albany and at Distance. We currently have up to 15 elected board members that constitute our governance board, including three executive positions: president, treasurer and secretary.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Massey University Students' Association Palmerston North Incorporated CC33798

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 7/10/2024 $2,967,826 $2,372,839 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 19/05/2024 $3,362,363 $3,182,810 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 14/06/2022 $88,177 $22,512 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Cindy Chanci Accounts Administrator 7/10/2024
Katrina Ann Webb Advocate 7/10/2024
Man Ting Wong Crockett Finance Manager 27/06/2024

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anushika Rea Prasad Manawatū Pasifika Student Representative 28/04/2025
Hennessey Sean Wilson General / Distance President 28/04/2025
Micah Geiringer Kaiwhakahaere ō Manawatahi 28/04/2025
Shayne Anton Sullivan Kaiwhakahaere ō Te Waka o Ngā Ākonga Māori 28/04/2025
Jacqueline Adams Operations Manager 10/01/2025
Wesley Katonivualiku Tusani Peters Pasifika Co-President 31/12/2024
Wendy Sue Carr General Manager 26/09/2024
Jacqueline Rea Adams Operations Manager 9/09/2024
Cameron Brooke Taylor Manawhakahaere 7/08/2024
Te Kakenga Kawiti Bishara Kaiwhakahaere ō Pāmamao 21/06/2024
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/01/2025 NOC027
28/11/2024 NOC026
7/10/2024 NOC024
26/09/2024 NOC023
9/09/2024 NOC022
9/09/2024 NOC021
26/08/2024 NOC020
1/07/2024 NOC019
19/06/2024 NOC018
17/05/2024 NOC016
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.