Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Torbay Dramatic Society Incorporated
Torbay Theatre
CC59764
9429043268689
Registered

Registration details

30/12/2021
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 89137
Torbay
Auckland
0742
35 Watea Road
Torbay
Auckland
0630

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/TorbayTheatre/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects for which the Society is established are: (a) To promote and encourage dramatic works and plays, whether a stage play, musical, comedy, or pantomime; and to provide musical and dramatic education. (b) To promote and encourage good fellowship amongst the community of all people interested in the issues of stage craft: i.e. Actors, Choreographers, Directors, Lighting/Sound Designers and Technicians, Musical Directors, Pianists and all Instrumentalists, Production Managers, Properties

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Entity Structure

Torbay Theatre is run by a committee elected each year at the Annual General Meeting which generally meets on a monthly basis. The committee sets the budget and appoints a production team headed by the director and production manager to oversee the day to day operations of each production the theatre stages. The committee also oversees the organisation of other activities such as Club Nights and youth development.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 31/07/2023 6/01/2024 $17,004 $21,894 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anne Rimmer Chairperson 12/04/2023
Peter Segrove Committee Member 12/04/2023
Theresa Lynden Bearsley Committee Member 29/03/2023
Daphne Mavis Goddard Committee Member 28/12/2021
Graham Arthur John Mandeno Committee Member 8/05/2021
Lynette Wrigley-Brown Secretary 8/05/2021
Helen Marie Topliss Immediate Past President 30/03/2021
Valerie Pearl Langford Committee Member 30/03/2021
Kyle Leo Edward Perwick Treasurer 1/01/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Emily Louise Clarkson Committee Member 29/03/2023
Jacqueline Ruth Mandeno Committee Member 29/03/2023
Sophia Esther Burton Immediate Past President/Assistant Secretary 29/03/2023
Robert Bruce Rosoman Committee Member 24/05/2022
Jill Reid Committee Member 30/03/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/06/2022 NOC003
15/04/2022 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.