pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Winterstellar Charitable Trust
CC59775
9429050214174
Registered

Registration details

12/01/2022
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 1
Alexandra
9340
34 Ashworth Street
Alexandra
9320

Charity's other details

Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/Winterstellar20


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust purposes are to: 1. To foster a greater general appreciation of the night sky through astrophotography and other arts; 2. To educate and foster a greater general understanding of the night sky through astronomy and other sciences; 3. To promote Maori Mātauranga and narratives, including Matariki, with respect to our understanding of the night sky; and 4. To promote the benefits of the dark skies of Otago and Southland, New Zealand 5. And all matters incidental to the above purposes

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

We are based in Central Otago, New Zealand and are governed by our trust deed. The deed outlines that we must have between 2 and 12 trustees and provides for voting system among the trustees in order to make decisions.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2022 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrew Davey Trustee 30/11/2021
Brian John Boyle Trustee 30/11/2021
Paul James Le Comte Trustee 30/11/2021
Victoria Susan Bowman Trustee 30/11/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/01/2022 NOC002
17/01/2022 NOC001

Charity Documents