pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Plymouth Genealogy Society Incorporated
CC60004
N/A
Registered

Registration details

6/04/2022
March 31

Address for service

122 Wairau Road
Oakura
4314

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
New Plymouth Genealogy Society Inc


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Primary purpose of the society is to promote the study of Family Histories, Genealogies and Local Histories to members. To provide educational services and advance the education of the public in the study of Family, Local Histories and Genealogies.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Education / training / research

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We are an Incorporated Society, based in New Plymouth, Taranaki. We have a committee of at least 5 members, including a Convenor, Secretary and Treasurer.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2022 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Annette Maree Larsen Committee Member 1/12/2021
Jackie Maree Sewell Secretary 1/12/2021
Patricia Lea Bellini Committee Member 1/12/2021
Karen Maree Crowe Committee Member 29/11/2021
Lorraine Margaret Austin Committee Member 29/11/2021
Sharyn June Guthrie Treasurer 29/11/2021
Gail Maree Tanner Convenor 18/11/2021
Graeme Victor Jury Committee Member 18/11/2021

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents