Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Harmony Community Trust
CC60165
N/A
Registered

Registration details

21/02/2022
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 33430
Barrington
Spreydon
Christchurch
8244
Flat 1
198 Antigua Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Advancing education by providing a place that benefits the community and works towards providing personal development and education opportunities in a holistic and unified way. As well as supporting development of hauora in Christchurch through education, youthwork, life coaching and more.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable trust governed by trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2022 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 29/02/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kerry Piper Trustee 21/02/2022
Gideon Hoekendijk Donor and Trustee 11/02/2022
Joshua Wharton Trustee 11/02/2022
Donna Cherry Trustee 10/02/2022
Romald Karan Trustee 10/02/2022

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.