Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rakau o te Ora Trust
CC60388
9429043298280
Registered

Registration details

18/07/2022
March 31

Address for service

1 Burton Street
Grafton
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/nz.shincheonji

Oceania

Samoa


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance within New Zealand and Samoa the Christian religion as practiced by the body of Christian persons known as the Shincheonji Church of Jesus Temple of the Tabernacle of the Testimony.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research

Religious groups

Entity Structure

We have a head office based in Auckland. The Trust must have no fewer than two and no more than eight Trustees. We have two Trustees that currently comprise the Board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jade Oskar Harvey Robertson Trustee 12/12/2023
Darryn Rex Bell Trustee 7/06/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ye Jin Lee Secretary 5/03/2024
Mark Antony Holliday Trustee 8/08/2023
Scott Gene Watson Settlor and Trustee 8/08/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/03/2024 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.