Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tūhura Tech
CC60416
9429050522712
Registered

Registration details

25/05/2022
December 31

Address for service

31 Townsend Road
Miramar
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/p/T%C5%ABhura-Tech-100083052084710
https://www.instagram.com/tuhura_tech/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Tūhura Tech is a not-for-profit, charitable trust that provides free, fun and interactive tech programmes for children and youth. Our programmes inspire children and youth to explore tech and to extend their knowledge. We also promote networking and sharing of resources and information between STEM organisations, industry and schools.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides educational programmes and a digital hub)

Education / training / research

Community development, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

General public

Entity Structure

Tūhura Tech is based in the Wellington region. Our trust deed states that we must have between three and ten Trustees. We currently have four Trustees that constitute our governance board, including three executive positions: President, Secretary and Treasurer. The Trust meets monthly to discuss strategic and at times operational matters.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 3/07/2023 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Barrow Secretary 6/04/2022
Justin Chua Trustee 6/04/2022
Leon Bowie Chair 6/04/2022
Lillian Pak Treasurer 6/04/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Danielle Sims Trustee 1/02/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/02/2023 NOC002
7/09/2022 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.