Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Ratonga Poumanaaki Trust
CC60478
N/A
Registered

Registration details

28/08/2022
March 31

Address for service

6B Norris Street
Tauranga
3110

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To campaign and education people on Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder (FASD) and Neurodiversity's in Aotearoa. To advocate for and develop initiatives that empower and encourage education engagement for the neurodiverse and suffer mental health or mental wellbeing constraints. To prevent our neurodiverse youth from committing crimes and keeping communities safe.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, People with disabilities

Children / young people

People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We are currently located and operating in the Bay of Plenty and operating in the Waikato Region with the intention of rolling out our initiatives to the whole of Aotearoa. We are currently a board of 3 members but can have up to 10 members and aspire to grow our charity and board members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 18/08/2023 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bernice Breckon Trustee 1/08/2022
Jasmine Douglas Chairperson 1/08/2022
John Breckon Trustee 1/08/2022

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.