Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The B.R.A.V.E. Foundation
CC60531
9429050734597
Registered

Registration details

30/08/2022
March 31

Address for service

11 Napier Terrace
Hospital Hill
Napier
4110

Charity's other details

The BRAVE Foundation


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support young people in the community who are victims of sexual abuse, and to teach skills and instill confidence and self-esteem in those young people, through the provision of semi-annual retreats.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

A registered charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 31/07/2023 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Karen Anne Hart Trustee 1/08/2022
Vanessa Louise Gillespie Trustee 1/08/2022
Stacey Rene Tito Trustee 26/07/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/09/2023 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.