pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Siddhartha's Intent NZ
CC60643
N/A
Registered

Registration details

20/10/2022
March 31

Address for service

56 Park Terrace
Corsair Bay
Lyttelton
8082

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote and advance the religion of Buddhism.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Entity Structure

A charitable trust governed by trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 17/10/2023 $76,541 $17,607

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kimberley Alice Nicole Saxton Donor and Trustee 17/10/2022
Xueli Sun Trustee 17/10/2022
Hannah Huia Hegan Ngatai Trustee 13/04/2022

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents