Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Arawa Iwi Māori Partnership Board
Te Taura Ora O Waiariki
CC60859
9429050985494
Registered

Registration details

29/11/2022
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 987
Rotorua
3040
1227 Ranolf Street
Rotorua 3010
Rotorua
3010

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/TeArawaIMPB


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(a) to foster and promote hauora Māori by identifying, developing and promoting local Māori perspectives on: (i) the needs and aspirations of Māori in the Te Arawa rohe in relation to hauora Māori outcomes; and (ii) how the health sector is performing in relation to those needs and aspirations; and (iii) the design and delivery of services and public health interventions within localities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Health

Education / training / research

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 20/12/2024 $1,486,869 $723,244 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 7/01/2024 $429,588 $186,529 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hingatu Thompson Individual Trustee 23/07/2024
Rāwiri Bhana Individual Trustee 23/07/2024
Te Rau Aroha Morgan Trustee 1/11/2022
Amelia Jennifer Kaka-Scott Trustee 1/07/2022
John Porima Trustee 1/07/2022
Lauren James Trustee 1/07/2022
Ruth Louise Swinton Trustee 1/07/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Grace Malcolm Chair and Trustee 12/02/2024
Terri Mapihi Raharuhi Trustee 30/09/2023
Jonathan Te Rire Co-Chair and Trustee 10/05/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/07/2024 NOC005
28/02/2024 NOC004
11/05/2023 NOC002
2/05/2023 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.