Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Cyclone Gabrielle Appeal Trust
CC61006
N/A
Registered

Registration details

2/26/2023
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 8052
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
45 Pipitea Street
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust is to provide relief to the communities, iwi, hapū and marae of all districts or regions in which a state of emergency was declared for the effects of Cyclone Gabrielle (Cyclone) or other extreme weather events in January and February 2023. The specific objectives of the Trust are: (a) the relief of poverty; and (b) the advancement of education; and (c) the advancement of religion; and (d) the advancement of any other purposes beneficial for the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Emergency / disaster relief

General public

Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities

Entity Structure

The Trust is headquartered in Wellington, with Trustees based in Wellington and Gisborne. The Trust Deed requires that there shall be at all times at least 2 Trustees, and enables the Settlor to appoint new Trustees. It is anticipated that the Trust will usually have at least three trustees. The Trustees may establish and seek advice from an Advisory Panel, who may advise the Trustees on activities that will further the objects of the Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2023 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
6/30/2024 12/31/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
3/31/2023 9/30/2023 - - - - Exempt
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 16 months from 26 February 2023 to 30 June 2024

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Barbara Arnott Trustee 3/16/2023
Selwyn Parata Trustee 2/26/2023
Paul James Trustee 2/24/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/26/2023 NOC004
5/11/2023 NOC003
3/2/2023 NOC002
3/1/2023 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.