pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Money Managed Smarter
CC61009
9429051009700
Registered

Registration details

19/12/2022
March 31

Address for service

3 Harry Human Heights
Saint Johns
Auckland
1072

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Providing financial literacy education to persons in New Zealand who have limited or no understanding of their finances and providing programs and workshops that assist people to become less reliant on debt and improve their financial well-being.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust governed by Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 28/09/2023 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Helen Mary Hailwood Trustee 16/12/2022
Dietmar Sitani Dyck Trustee 14/12/2022
Timothy Paul Symons Trustee 14/12/2022

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents