Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Ara Pōtiki Trust
Te Ara Pōtiki
CC61118
9429051122782
Registered

Registration details

14/02/2023
March 31

Address for service

21 Dairy Farm Road
Palmerston North
4440

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Te Ara Pōtiki Trust has been established and is to be maintained for the purpose of supporting and uplifting Māori, by addressing the level and extent of Māori capability, engagement and involvement in connection with high growth start-ups and technology enterprises and increasing the number of Māori participating in and leading such enterprises.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Education / training / research

Employment

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

Te Ara Pōtiki is a charitable trust with its terms set out in its trust deed dated 3 February 2023. Te Ara Pōtiki is governed by its board, comprising a minimum of 3 and a maximum of 7 trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2023 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 14/10/2024 14/10/2024 $554,192 $148,661 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Arama Hura Kukutai Trustee 3/02/2023
Dean Christopher Tilyard Trustee 3/02/2023
Francene Yvette Georgina Avery Wineti Trustee 3/02/2023

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.