Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Intensive Care Medicine Education Trust
CC61277
9429051167257
Registered

Registration details

22/05/2023
December 31

Address for service

42 Sunrise Boulevard
Tawa
Wellington
5028
Intensive Care Unit, Wellington Hospital
Riddiford Street
Newtown
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance specialist medical care through the promotion and delivery of education courses.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health

General public

Entity Structure

Charitable trust domiciled in New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 10/02/2024 $74,077 $60,579 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alexander John Psirides Trustee 1/01/2023
Colin Stewart Barnes Settlor 1/01/2023
Fiona Catherine Wild Trustee 1/01/2023
Kathryn Jane Tietjens Trustee 1/01/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/01/2024 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.