Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Nevertheless Trust
Nevertheless
CC61299
N/A
Registered

Registration details

3/05/2023
March 31

Address for service

27A Forest Hill Road
Henderson
Auckland
0612

Charity's other details

Nevertheless NZ
instagram.com/nevertheless_nz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

- Providing safe spaces for kōrero and talanoa about Mental Health for Māori, Pasifika and Rainbow peoples, whānau and communities -Supporting the holistic development of LGBTQIA+, MVPFAFF+ Takatāpui and Rainbow+ peoples including physical, mental, emotional and spiritual - Educating whānau and communities about Mental Health whilst promoting indigenous and contemporary methods of creativity as safe and positive tools of expression

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Other (please state)

(Takatāpui, LGBTQIA+, MVPFAFF+, and whānau)

Entity Structure

We currently work remotely around Aotearoa with a current focus on the regions where board members are based - Auckland and Hawkes Bay region, with the intent of expanding Nationwide.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

There are no public Annual Return records for this charity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Shaqaila Uelese Co-Director 1/04/2023
Maia Wati-Cooper Co-Director 7/03/2023
Alieta Uelese TRUSTEE 30/01/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/06/2023 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.