Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Youth Impact Foundation Limited
Burn Bright, Attitude, The Burn Bright Group
CC61301
9429047856691
Registered

Registration details

21/03/2023
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Burn Bright Group Limited 21/03/2023
The Youth Impact Foundation Limited 28/03/2024

Address for service

PO Box 9287
Tower Junction
Addington
Christchurch
8149
51 Princess Street
Riccarton
Christchurch
8041

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Youth Impact Foundation exists to build a world where young people flourish, understand their influence and impact the world selflessly. By conducting activities specifically focused on educating young people on positive wellbeing through relationships, self-awareness, values, goal setting and grit/resilience; leadership where they understand their influence, and are motivated by a vision to serve their communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Children / young people

General public

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 31 March 2023 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 27/09/2024 $83,918 $76,656 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lucy Coulston Board Member 1/12/2023
Michaela Latimer Board member 29/11/2022
Susan Emerson Board Member 22/10/2020
Andrew Skidmore Board Member 17/12/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lissa Jane Birse Board Member 23/03/2025
Whetu Campbell Board Member 23/03/2025
Gregory Morgan Board member 25/03/2024
Leendert STEMMET Board member 25/03/2024
Matthew Schultz Board member 1/03/2024

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/03/2025 NOC007
24/04/2024 NOC005
28/03/2024 NOC002
27/03/2024 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.