Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Grey Lynn Community Centre Trust
CC61519
9429051545185
Registered

Registration details

21/08/2023
June 30

Address for service

510 Richmond Road
Grey Lynn
Auckland
1021

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our purpose is to be an integral part of Grey Lynn with values that reflect the diversity of the area, that supports cultural and creative expression and strengthens community by developing connections and networks. Delivered through: Facilitating a diverse range of activities to provide for the whole community. Enabling a safe environment for people to gather. Facilitating affordable spaces for community activities and presenting a clean & welcoming facility.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 19/12/2024 $120,319 $189,650 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Christine Sharma Trustee 13/08/2023
Christopher Raymond Nolan-Downs Trustee 13/08/2023
Jianping Cai Trustee 13/08/2023
Matthew Aidan Nolan-Downs Trustee 13/08/2023
Ritika Singh Trustee 13/08/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Kaponga Clifford Erueti Trustee 12/03/2024
Cameron Owens Trustee 12/11/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/07/2024 NOC004
2/04/2024 NOC003
12/03/2024 NOC002
29/08/2023 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.