Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


BetterMan Charitable Trust
BetterMan
CC61904
9429051948344
Registered

Registration details

25/09/2023
March 31

Address for service

27 Townshend Crescent
Halswell
Christchurch
8025

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/BetterManNZ
https://www.instagram.com/BetterManNZ


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Helping New Zealand men, primarily aged between 25 and 50, to better manage their physical and mental health and wellbeing.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Health

Fund-raising

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Anthony Jessep Trustee 23/05/2024
Elizabeth Anne Scott Trustee 23/05/2024
Jason Richard Wills Trustee 23/05/2024
Tarina Marie Stephens Trustee 23/05/2024
Ryan Morrison Astle Settlor, Trustee, Executive Manager 18/09/2023
David Joseph Wakefield Trustee, Secretary 10/09/2023
Gerard Paul Robinson Trustee 7/09/2023
Todd Duncan Astle Trustee, Chairperson 7/09/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/05/2024 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.