Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tika Charitable Trust
Tika
CC62989
N/A
Registered

Registration details

2/08/2024
March 31

Address for service

50 Albert Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charity will focus on increasing awareness of and access to the justice system for people who have experienced sexual harm as children, teenagers or adults. The Trustees propose to do this by developing and disseminating educative materials, developing innovative technologies and providing legal assistance to individuals who have suffered sexual harm and individuals who have witnessed sexual harm.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Education / training / research

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alison Jane Mau Trustee 31/07/2024
Arran MacDonald Hunt Trustee 31/07/2024
Hayden James Patuiki Wilson Trustee 31/07/2024
Joanne Robyn Stansfield Trustee 31/07/2024
Pruedence Jane Tama-Te-Kapua Trustee 31/07/2024
Zoe Ruth Lawton Trustee 31/07/2024

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/02/2025 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.