Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The New Zealand Hermitage Charitable Trust
CC51223
N/A
Registered

Registration details

16/01/2015
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 8179
Havelock North
4157
15 Arataki Road
Havelock North
4130

Charity's other details

06 877 6631


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our purpose is to promote an alternative holistic approach to mental health particularly in the case of a spiritual emergency be it a physio Kundalini syndrome or sometimes in the manifestation and diagnosis of schizophrenia, Bipolar, affective disorder, depression as in a dark night of the soul and so on

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

1. provision of support services as outlined above2. development of a system and process to enable our volunteers to provide the support and assistance our clients need3. public education

Health

Accommodation / housing, Social services, Religious activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Those undergoing a spiritual emergence affecting mental health

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 26/04/2024 $4,544 $1,911 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 26/04/2023 $6,750 $6,414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 10/05/2022 $2,369 $3,767 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/06/2021 $2,759 $14,568 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 16/09/2020 $5,881 $600 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 31/05/2019 $17,017 $1,852 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 8/05/2018 $7,303 $1,430 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 13/07/2017 $345 $305 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 23/06/2016 $1,480 $1,505 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Gordon Sorensen treasurer 1/01/2021
Joanna Mackenzie Trustee 12/06/2017
Rebecca Elizabeth Russell Mackenzie Trustee 12/06/2017
Anna Maud Stewart Natusch Trustee/Secretary 19/04/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ingo Lambrecht Trustee 30/11/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/01/2021 NOC008
21/08/2019 NOC006
28/07/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.