Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Zero Waste Network Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Localised Limited
Zero Waste Aotearoa

Group Details


Zero Waste Network Group

Registration details

Registered
22/09/2020
CC58216
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 18164
Glen Innes
Auckland
1743
153 Pilkington Road
Point England
Auckland
1072

Group's other details

021975352


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2025 31/12/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 24/09/2024 $4,414,554 $3,593,522 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 28/11/2023 $2,917,938 $2,667,803 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 31/07/2023 $784,828 $1,081,333 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 1/03/2022 $541,910 $679,096 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 4/11/2020 $866,640 $520,848 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Zero Waste Network Group represents community enterprises across Aotearoa who are working towards Zero Waste in their community. Our mission is to connect, educate, enable and inspire these community enterprises to reach their goals while acting as a unifying voice on behalf of these entities at local, regional and central government levels.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Employment, Economic development

Other charities

General public

Entity Structure

Zero Waste Network (ZWN) is the trading name of the Trust. ZWN has a membership structure of community enterprises involved in Zero Waste activities and promotions. The Trustees are elected from and by the members with an Executive Director employed. Localised Limited is 100% owned by the Trust and has been established to promote Zero Waste based community enterprises as a practical tool which empowers communities to develop a local environmental, social and economic solution.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/11/2024 NOC006

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.