Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Zero Waste Aotearoa
CC29744
9429043038299
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Community Enterprise Network (NZ) Trust 30/06/2008
Zero Waste Aotearoa 13/03/2025

Address for service

PO Box 18164
Glen Innes
Auckland
1743
153 Pilkington Road
Point England
Auckland
1072

Charity's other details

021975352


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Zero Waste Network Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Localised Limited
Zero Waste Aotearoa

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Zero Waste Network represents community enterprises across Aotearoa who are working towards Zero Waste in their community. Our mission is to connect, educate, enable and inspire these community enterprises to reach their goals while acting as a unifying voice on behalf of these entities at local, regional and central government levels.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Employment, Economic development

Other charities

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 Member of 'Zero Waste Network Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 Member of 'Zero Waste Network Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 Member of 'Zero Waste Network Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 Member of 'Zero Waste Network Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 15/10/2019 $574,229 $514,018 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 26/11/2018 $456,652 $391,482 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/11/2017 $382,120 $375,408 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 21/03/2017 $242,697 $210,288 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 13/06/2016 $122,644 $145,476 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Aroha Christine Beckham Trustee 1/03/2023
Kelli Marie Pike Trustee and Wellbeing Officer 27/10/2022
Catherine Isobel de Monchy Trustee 16/09/2021
Michael João Tavares Trustee 16/09/2021
Karen Driver Trustee & Chairperson 15/05/2013
Marty Hoffart Trustee 2/04/2013
Clifford Colquhoun Trustee 1/05/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Samuel John Paterson Trustee 11/02/2025
Polly Isabel Jennifer Griffiths Trustee 10/07/2024
Sue Wallis Trustee 21/11/2023
Jacqui Forbes Trustee 7/02/2023
Richard Thorpe Trustee 19/09/2022
Jon Morgan Trustee 16/09/2021
Susan Jane Coutts Trustee 26/07/2021
Andrew Walters Trustee 12/05/2021
Treena Gowthorpe Trustee 2/09/2020
Matthew Graham Luxon Trustee 23/10/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/03/2025 NOC032
3/02/2025 NOC031
11/11/2024 NOC030
11/07/2024 NOC029
24/08/2023 NOC026
30/03/2023 NOC024
8/03/2022 NOC022
10/02/2021 NOC020
23/05/2019 NOC015
29/11/2017 NOC013
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.