Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Cobden Mercy Outreach Incorporated
CC31586
9429042666677
Deregistered
31/03/2024

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Cobden Mercy Outreach Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 31/03/2024 The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up)
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

31 Wickes Street
Cobden
Greymouth
7802

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Support for Women and their families. Providing temporary accommodation for people in different circumstances.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Health, Religious activities

Other (please state)

(Women and Children)

Entity Structure

The company is managed by the 3 directors.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Cecil Marie Teasdale Chairperson 13/12/2013
Anne McLaughlin Officer 30/06/2008
Theresa Scott Officer 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Judith Tranter Officer 16/12/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/02/2017 NOC008
29/09/2016 NOC007
29/09/2016 NOC006
16/12/2013 NOC004
13/12/2013 NOC003
15/04/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.