Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Sisters of Mercy Ministries New Zealand.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Cobden Mercy Outreach Incorporated
Mercy Assisi Home & Hospital Hamilton Limited
Mercy Ministries Limited
Sisters of Mercy Elderly Outreach Limited
Te Ngākau Waiora Mercy Centre Limited

Group Details


Deregistration details

Sisters of Mercy Ministries New Zealand
CC31478
Deregistered
The single entity status ceased as there was only one remaining registered group member.
05/12/2024

Following were the details for Sisters of Mercy Ministries New Zealand at the date of deregistration:

Sisters of Mercy Ministries New Zealand

Registration details

Deregistered
21/09/2008
CC31478
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 5/12/2024 The single entity status ceased as there was only one remaining registered group member.
Registered 21/09/2008

Address for service

Group's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/11/2023 23/11/2023 $102,472,000 $103,805,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 31/10/2022 $97,654,000 $92,676,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/11/2021 29/11/2021 $95,523,000 $86,435,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $86,906,000 $84,732,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $91,913,000 $82,138,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 25/09/2018 $84,553,000 $82,759,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $80,211,000 $74,411,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $81,312,000 $76,513,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 24/09/2015 $67,033,754 $65,565,572 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Group is to carry out the apostolic works for Nga Whatea Atawhai o Aotearoa Sisters of Mercy New Zealand within New Zealand . This includes the delivery of healthcare, education, community and social services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Social services, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups, Children / young people

Entity Structure

The group consists of 17 trading subsidiaries plus the parent Trust. The parent has 5 Trustees who have delegated their authority to a Trust Board of 7. The subsidiaries each have their own board.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/09/2022 NOC011
26/09/2011 AR004
22/09/2010 AR003

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.