Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Braemar Hospital Limited
CC22667
9429037135263
Registered

Registration details

8/04/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 972
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
24 Ohaupo Road
Hamilton Lake
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

(07)8392166
(07)8343944


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Braemar Charitable Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Braemar Charitable Trust
Braemar Hospital Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The primary objective of the trust is to manage and apply the Trust Fund for Charitable purposes within New Zealand. Charitable purposes being: • The encouragement and furtherance of medical research • The provision and development of, whether directly or through subsidiaries, funding or otherwise, medical facilities in New Zealand, including hospitals, for the treatment of persons • The encouragement of the use of such medical facilities whether by provision of medical grants or free or subsidised medical assistance, sponsorship or otherwise • The development of medical knowledge • The donation of medical equipment

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Surgical Hospital), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

Braemar Charitable Trust and Braemar Hospital Limited are registered as a charitable entity under the Charities Act 2005, as part of the Braemar Charitable Trust group. The group consists of Braemar Charitable Trust (Parent) and its subsidiary Braemar Hospital Limited.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kathryn Marina Sherwood Ayers Director 1/09/2021
Graeme Roderick Milne Director, Chairman 1/10/2020
Bella Takiari - Brame Director 24/04/2020
Renae Smart Director 1/04/2020
Glen Devcich Director 1/04/2014
John Clarkson Director 1/04/2014
Brian Whitley Director 1/08/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Greg Spark Director 27/09/2021
Graham Arthur Naylor Director 28/09/2020
Lionel Max Lamb Director 28/09/2020
Ian Jennings Director 31/03/2020
Patrick Bary Director 31/03/2020
Christopher Michael Holdaway Director 31/03/2014
Robert James Cameron Director 27/03/2012
Allan Rex Gough Director 23/08/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/10/2020 NOC010
25/09/2015 NOC003
23/11/2009 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.