Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Braemar Charitable Trust Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Braemar Charitable Trust
Braemar Hospital Limited

Group Details


Braemar Charitable Trust Group

Registration details

Registered
7/04/2008
CC22670
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 972
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3240
24 Ohaupo Road
24 Ohaupo Road
Hamilton Lake
Hamilton
3204

Group's other details

027 2242316


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 7/10/2024 $71,814,003 $70,624,525 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 20/07/2023 $60,707,266 $58,257,084 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 22/08/2022 $59,736,357 $56,480,498 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 26/07/2021 $53,486,924 $49,085,509 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 9/09/2020 $49,707,696 $46,871,770 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 25/09/2019 $48,288,922 $44,053,811 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 20/08/2018 $43,713,293 $39,866,101 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 21/09/2017 $40,956,592 $37,191,723 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 13/09/2016 $38,003,646 $34,705,995 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The primary objective of the trust is to manage and apply the Trust Fund for Charitable purposes within New Zealand. Charitable purposes being: - The encouragement and furtherance of medical research - The provision and development of, whether directly or through subsidiaries, funding or otherwise, medical facilities in New Zealand, including hospitals, for the treatment of persons - The encouragement of the use of such medical facilities whether by provision of medical grants or free or subsidised medical assistance, sponsorship or otherwise - The development of medical knowledge - The donation of medical equipment

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health

General public

Other charities

Entity Structure

Braemar Charitable Trust and Braemar Hospital Limited are registered as a charitable entity under the Charities Act 2005, as part of the Braemar Charitable Trust group. The group consists of Braemar Charitable Trust (Parent) and its subsidiary Braemar Hospital Limited.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/09/2010 AR002

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.