Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Trok Building Limited
CC43952
9429035902614
Registered

Registration details

7/04/2010
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 19165
Hamilton
3244
59 Higgins Road
3 London Street
Frankton
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 846 1042


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Runanga o Kirikiriroa Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Te Runanga O Kirikiriroa Charitable Trust
Trok Building Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Runanga and subsidiaries are mandated to focus on issues relating to Article III of the Treaty of Waitangi, and represent the needs of Maataa waka and Pacific peoples who live within the city boundaries.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development

Family / whanau

Other charities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, other charity - Te Runanga o Kirikiriroa Trust Inc

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act
Te Runanga O Kirikiriroa Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2011.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 26/11/2024 $1,002,303 $1,669,326 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 10/01/2024 $890,351 $1,330,078 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 22/11/2022 $980,236 $1,180,375 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 21/12/2021 $2,185,143 $1,186,998 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 17/12/2020 $895,833 $803,345 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/01/2020 9/12/2019 $640,754 $756,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 16/12/2018 $673,426 $735,573 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2018 $1,104,901 $854,382 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 12/02/2017 $4,015,578 $1,086,586 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 30/12/2015 $1,569,045 $1,399,141 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kim Cable Trustee 27/11/2024
Nonumaifele TuiSamoa Trustee 27/11/2024
Hagen Tautari Director 1/01/2022
Andrea Maryanne Elliott-Hohepa Director 29/11/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Karleen Puriri Director 14/11/2024
Mike Rarere Director 31/12/2021
Owen Purcell director 31/12/2021
Mere Tiki Balzer director 29/11/2017
Matiu Dickson director 7/04/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/12/2024 NOC014
14/11/2024 NOC012
28/02/2018 NOC004

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.